AB71
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning the equitable allocation of money distributed from the Local Government Tax Distribution Account. (BDR S-256)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb 22, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 24, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 05, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.