SB46
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Revenue

Allocates a portion of revenue from the premium tax on captive insurance to the Commission on Economic Development for promotion of the captive insurance industry. (BDR 57-411)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation and rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)