SB48
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions relating to permitting and enforcement of standards for oversize and overweight vehicles operating on Nevada highways. (BDR 43-485)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 08, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 05, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 266     Amend. No. 671   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 266.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 671.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)