SB51
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions relating to the reporting of and imposition of penalties for certain convictions for the violation of certain traffic laws. (BDR 43-492)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 96.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 01, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 08, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 10, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 12, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 408   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 408.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

May 18, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 96.
  • Sections 1, 3, 4 and 5 effective October 1, 2011. Section 2 effective January 1, 2012.