SB52
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to vital statistics. (BDR 40-446)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 08, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 85   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 546   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 85   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 85.)
  • Action of adoption of amendment rescinded.
  • Amendment No. 546 adopted.
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 27, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)