SB54
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing the Fund to Increase the Quality of Nursing Care. (BDR 38-444)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 314.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 10, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Feb 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 03, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation
  Senate Finance     Mar 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Mar 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr 01, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 14, 2011     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 31, 2011     04:30 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 29, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 795   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 07, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 27, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 28, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 795.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 314.
  • Effective June 13, 2011, and expires by limitation on July 1, 2013.