SB55
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions governing crimes against older persons. (BDR 18-204)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 332.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 15, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 21, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 625   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 16, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read second time.

Feb 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 21, 2011

Feb 22, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 625.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 625 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 332.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.