SB56
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions governing the entities required to use the services and equipment of the Department of Information Technology. (BDR 19-426)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Mar 29, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)