SB63
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Revises provisions relating to industrial insurance and the Uninsured Employers' Claim Account. (BDR 53-476)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 02, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 22   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor, and Energy. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 31, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 22.) To printer.

Apr 05, 2011

Apr 06, 2011

Apr 08, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.