SB64
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment

Establishes a program for the investment of state money in certificates of deposit at a reduced rate of interest to provide lending institutions with money for loans at a reduced rate of interest to certain eligible entities. (BDR 31-522)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Feb 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 02, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 25, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 26, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 307   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 307.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)