SB65
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions concerning the publication of certain financial information by certain local governments. (BDR 21-400)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 518.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 14, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 54     Amend. No. 645   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 54.) To printer.

Apr 08, 2011

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2011

Apr 15, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 645.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 645 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 518.
  • Effective June 17, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act, and January 15, 2012, for all other purposes.