SB76
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Transportation

Prohibits the use of a cellular telephone or other handheld wireless communications device while operating a motor vehicle in certain circumstances. (BDR 43-461)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)