SB78
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises provisions governing collective bargaining between local government employers and local government employees. (BDR 23-316)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)