SB79
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Revenue

Makes various changes relating to the Tobacco Master Settlement Agreement. (BDR 32-291)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 214.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Mar 31, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Apr 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     May 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 19, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 198   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 198.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 214.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.