AB74
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises various provisions relating to the regulation of the insurance industry. (BDR 57-472)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 506.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 25, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 02, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 01, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 03, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 442     Amend. No. 903   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 442.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 903.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 06, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 903 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 506.
  • Sections 9.5, 51.9, and 132 of this act effective June 17, 2011. Sections 1 to 9, inclusive, 10 to 51.7, inclusive, 52 to 56, inclusive, and 58 to 131, inclusive, of this act effective: (a) June 17, 2011, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) October 1, 2011, for all other purposes. Section 57 of this act effective January 1, 2013. Sections 24 and 25 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational, and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. (Effective dates revised by Assembly Bill 499 [Chapter 553, Statutes of Nevada 2013].)