SB81
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes relating to state financial administration. (BDR 31-396)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 101.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     Feb 15, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Mar 03, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     Mar 08, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 03, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 189   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 189.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 17, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2011

May 19, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 101.
  • Effective May 24, 2011.