SB82
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes relating to governmental information systems. (BDR 19-267)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 22, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 14, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 18     Amend. No. 647   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 18.) To printer.

Apr 08, 2011

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2011

Apr 15, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 647.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 647 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.