SB83
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions relating to transportation. (BDR 35-484)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 08, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Apr 15, 2011     11:42 AM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 05, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 416   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 416.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)