AB78
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to business. (BDR 7-403)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Revenue     Mar 08, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 24,   Nay 18,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2011   Yea 9,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 451   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 451.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 18.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • Action of refusal of passage rescinded.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Returned from enrollment.
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • (No further action taken.)