AB82
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-407)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 365.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 01, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 37,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 16, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 169     Amend. No. 567   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 169.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 567.) To printer.

May 16, 2011

May 17, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 567 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2011

  • Chapter 365.
  • Sections 1 to 37, inclusive, 40.5, 41, 42, 43, 48, 50, 51, 54, 56, 59 to 63, inclusive, 65, 66, 68, 69, 71, 72, 73, 84, and 85 of this act effective July 1, 2011. Sections 38, 39, 40, 44 to 47, inclusive, 49, 52, 53, 55, 57, 58, 64, 67, 70, and 74 to 83, inclusive, of this act effective January 16, 2013.