SB2
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 13, 2010.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Makes an appropriation to the State Distributive School Account to ensure that the amount of money expended per pupil meets or exceeds the national average. (BDR S-4)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)