SB88
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 07, 2011.
By: Judiciary

Enacts the Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act. (BDR 10-59)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 14, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 03, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 05, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 31   

Bill History

Jan 07, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 11, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 31.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.