AB89
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 07, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Requires certain policies of health insurance and health care plans to provide coverage for acupuncture treatments in certain circumstances. (BDR 57-278)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Jan 07, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Jan 11, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)