AB90
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 07, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Makes various changes to provisions relating to employment practices. (BDR 53-277)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 07, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Jan 07, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Jan 11, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)