SJR2
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 25, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to repeal the constitutional provision requiring the payment of a minimum wage. (BDR C-578)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Jan 25, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Jan 26, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)