SB92
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 25, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Makes various changes relating to development. (BDR 22-579)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 531.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 06, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Government Affairs     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After passage discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 37,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 593   

Bill History

Jan 25, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Jan 26, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 03, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 593.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 593 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 531.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.