SB96
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 25, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Revises provisions governing the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Program. (BDR 34-586)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 227.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 16, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Education     Feb 23, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Mar 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Apr 25, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 18, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 14, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 50   

Bill History

Jan 25, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Jan 26, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 50.) To printer.

Apr 08, 2011

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2011

Apr 15, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 227.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.