AB108
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 31, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Eliminates the deadline for registering to vote in an election. (BDR 24-686)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 22, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Jan 31, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 01, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)