SB104
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 01, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer

Provides for the biennial transfer of a portion of the state surplus to the Public Employees' Retirement Fund and the Fund for the Public Employees' Benefits Program. (BDR 31-701)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 01, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 02, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)