SB7
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 13, 2010.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Revises provisions governing the adoption of emergency regulations. (BDR 18-13)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 97.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 29, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 03, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 07, 2011

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 17, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2011

May 19, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 97.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.