SB131
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 07, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to tests of infants. (BDR 40-352)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 103.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 20, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 27, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 08, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 21, 2011

  • Read second time.

Feb 22, 2011

Feb 23, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2011

May 19, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 103.
  • Effective May 24, 2011.