AB151
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Atkinson, Oceguera, Smith, Kirkpatrick, Conklin, Bobzien, Dondero Loop, Horne, Munford

Makes various changes concerning the use of a cellular telephone or other handheld wireless communications device while operating a motor vehicle. (BDR 43-12)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 08, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 29, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 122   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 08, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 122.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)