AB152
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Atkinson, Horne, Bobzien, Benitez-Thompson, Conklin, Dondero Loop, Flores, Kirkpatrick, Mastroluca, Munford, Neal, Oceguera, Pierce, Smith

Creates an advisory committee to develop recommendations for the funding of highways in this State. (BDR S-180)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb 24, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 03, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Apr 28, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 08, 2011   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 28   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 01, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 28.) To printer.

Apr 05, 2011

Apr 08, 2011

Apr 11, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 29, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.