SB151
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Requires certain governmental entities to develop a plan for a regional rapid transit system. (BDR22-612)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 16, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 467     Amend. No. 648   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 467.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 648.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 648 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.
  • Effective June 15, 2011.