AB155
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Atkinson

Revises provisions relating to changes in rates of certain insurance. (BDR 57-727)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 23, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)