AB162
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Aizley, Ohrenschall, Segerblom, Pierce

Revises provisions governing the use of consumer credit information by an insurer. (BDR 57-910)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 18, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)