SB157
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener, Horsford, Denis, Parks, Breeden, Copening, Leslie, Manendo

Revises provisions governing the donation of unspent campaign contributions. (BDR 24-6)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 195.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 24, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 03, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass   Amendment proposed, failed
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 10, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 10, 2011

Mar 11, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 195.
  • Effective June 1, 2011.