AB170
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce, Ohrenschall, Anderson, Aizley, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Flores, Kirkpatrick, Mastroluca, Neal, Smith

Establishes provisions relating to warnings about the health hazards of smoking during pregnancy. (BDR 40-884)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 20, 2011   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 275     Amend. No. 584   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 275.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 584.) To printer.

May 20, 2011

May 23, 2011

  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 584 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.