SB158
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson

Revises provisions governing the frequency of required inspections of the emissions of certain motor vehicles. (BDR 40-310)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 06, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 15, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 423   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 423.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)