AB173
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Munford, Hogan

Prohibits the use of a cellular telephone or other handheld wireless communications device while operating a motor vehicle in certain circumstances. (BDR 43-104)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 08, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 29, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 08, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)