AB179
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson, Conklin, Segerblom, Carrillo, Brooks, Daly, Neal, Manendo, Parks

Revises provisions relating to disciplinary action against a public employee. (BDR 23-841)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 272.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 10, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 27, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 494     Amend. No. 773   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 494.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.)
  • To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 773.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 773 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Chapter 272.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.