AB182
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Authorizes the creation of inland ports. (BDR 22-177)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 16, 2011     11:07 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     May 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     May 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 20, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 133     Amend. No. 540   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 133.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 515.)
  • Action of adoption of Amendment No. 515 reconsidered.
  • Amendment No. 515 placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 540.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

May 23, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.