SB164
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Revises provisions relating to third-party administrators. (BDR 57-232)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 520.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 21, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 10,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Reconsideration    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 486     Amend. No. 859   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 486.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)
  • Notice of reconsideration.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 31, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 859.) To printer.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 520.
  • Effective June 17, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and January 1, 2012, for all other purposes.