SB171
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie

Revises the provisions governing the possession of dangerous weapons at certain locations. (BDRĀ 15-867)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 01, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 27, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)