SB175
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson, Settelmeyer, Cegavske, Hardy, Kieckhefer, Lee, McGinness, Roberson, Ellison, Goedhart, Goicoechea, Hambrick, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Kirner, McArthur

Revises provisions governing concealed firearms permits. (BDR 15-186)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 01, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 14, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2011

Apr 15, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)