SB180
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Breeden, Wiener, Aizley, Atkinson, Conklin, Oceguera

Expands provisions governing criminal and civil liability for certain crimes to include crimes motivated by the victim's gender identity or expression. (BDR 15-414)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 07, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 10,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 77   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011