SB20
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 13, 2010.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Requires insurers to provide certain information to survivors and dependents of deceased workers. (BDR 53-489)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor, and Energy. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)