SB184
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 22, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Requires the Public Utilities Commission of Nevada to open an investigatory docket concerning the establishment of a feed-in tariff program for renewable energy systems in this State. (BDR 58-229)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 476     Amend. No. 729   

Bill History

Feb 22, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 476.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 729.) To printer.

May 26, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 30, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)