SB21
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 13, 2010.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Revises certain provisions concerning catastrophic injuries. (BDR 53-479)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 157.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 406   

Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor, and Energy. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 406.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 157.
  • Effective May 30, 2011.