AB202
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 22, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Atkinson, Conklin, Kirner, Hardy, Hickey, Kirkpatrick

Provides for the partial abatement of certain property taxes for certain new manufacturing businesses in this State. (BDR 58-652)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 298.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     May 27, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     May 28, 2011     10:52 AM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 438   

Bill History

Feb 22, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 08, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 438.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

  • Read second time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 298.
  • Sections 20, 21, 22, and 23 of this act effective June 10, 2011. Sections 1 to 19, inclusive, of this act effective June 10, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and carrying out any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to implement the provisions of this act and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes.